EP0350714 - Tissue immobilization and cell culturing system and method for affixing biologically active moieties to a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLLABORATIVE BIOMEDICAL PRODUCTS INC. Two Oak Park Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states COLLABORATIVE BIOMEDICAL PRODUCTS INC. Two Oak Park Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | ||
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states BIO-POLYMERS, INC. P.O. Box 1307 Farmington Connecticut 06034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaturvedi, Nishith 33 Woods Run Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | 02 /
Picciano, Paul T. 31 Colony Road Canton, Connecticut 06019 / US | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111726.9 | 28.06.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | US19880218629 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: US 218629 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350714 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350714 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350714 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/08, C07K17/08, C12N5/00, A61L27/00 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C12N5/0068 (EP);
A61L27/36 (EP);
A61L27/38 (EP);
C12N2533/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Gewebe-Immobilisierungs- und Zellkultursystem und Verfahren zum Anbringen biologisch wirksamer Teile an einem Substrat | [1990/03] | English: | Tissue immobilization and cell culturing system and method for affixing biologically active moieties to a substrate | [1990/03] | French: | Système d'immobilisation de tissu et de culture de cellules et procédé pour attacher des moitiés biologiquement actives à un substrat | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.03.1994 | GR | 09.03.1994 | SE | 09.03.1994 | AT | 28.06.1994 | GB | 28.06.1994 | ES | 29.06.1994 | BE | 30.06.1994 | CH | 30.06.1994 | LI | 30.06.1994 | LU | 30.06.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [2002/24] | FR | 09.03.1994 | |
GR | 09.03.1994 | ||
SE | 09.03.1994 | ||
AT | 28.06.1994 | ||
GB | 28.06.1994 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | GR | 09.03.1994 | |
SE | 09.03.1994 | ||
AT | 28.06.1994 | ||
GB | 28.06.1994 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1996/02] | SE | 09.03.1994 | |
AT | 28.06.1994 | ||
GB | 28.06.1994 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/37] | SE | 09.03.1994 | |
GB | 28.06.1994 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | SE | 09.03.1994 | |
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | SE | 09.03.1994 | |
BE | 30.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62057562 ; | [A]JP62115064 ; | [AP]JP63264069 ; | [A]JP58206960 ; | [A]US3910819 (REMBAUM ALAN, et al); | [A]EP0223389 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]); | [A]EP0243818 (BIO POLYMERS INC [US]); | [XP]EP0280155 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, 1988, page 338, abstract no. 11759z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 057 562 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO. LTD.) 13-03-1987, & JP62057562 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, 1988, page 54, abstract no. 23066p, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 115 064 (AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGY) 26-05-1987, & JP62115064 A 00000000 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, 1989, page 430, abstract no. 180769z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 264 069 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD.) 31-10-1988, & JP63264069 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, 1984, page 270, abstract no. 153441c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 206 960 (SUSUMU INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. YOKOGAWA HOKUSHIN DENKI K.K.), & JP58206960 A 00000000 | Examination | JP6257562 | EP0223289 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, 1988, p. 338, abstract no. 11759z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 57 562 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO. LTD.) 13-03-1987, & JP6257562 A 00000000 |