Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] |
30.10.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] |
26.02.1992 | First examination report | |
11.01.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] |
18.11.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] |
18.11.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] |