Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0348966 | Global Dossier | 16.12.1992 | B1 | EP0348966 | 28.02.1990 | A3 | EP0348966 | 03.01.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP16134288 | 29.06.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68903890T | 13.05.1993 | T2 | DE68903890D1 | 28.01.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP16134288 | 29.06.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0720250B | 06.03.1995 | B2 | JPH0211086 | 16.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16134288 | 29.06.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR920004332B | 01.06.1992 | B1 | KR900001126 | 31.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16134288 | 29.06.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5038203 | 06.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16134288 | 29.06.1988 |