EP0348966 - Burst gate pulse generating circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA AUDIO VIDEO ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA AUDIO VIDEO ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagino, Hideyuki c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Okada, Teruo c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111828.3 | 29.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | JP19880161342 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: JP 16134288 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348966 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348966 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348966 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/455 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
H04N9/455 (EP,US);
H03K3/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/01] | Title | German: | Burst-Torimpulserzeugungsschaltung | [1990/01] | English: | Burst gate pulse generating circuit | [1990/01] | French: | Générateur d'impulsions de déclenchement de l'impulsion de synchronisation de couleur | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3949418 (SRIVASTAVA GOPAL KRISHNA); | [A]GB2146199 (RCA CORP) |