Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
05.11.1993 | First examination report | |
20.09.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] |
21.02.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |
25.11.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] |