EP0348988 - Slipping layer containing acyloxy-terminated siloxane for dye-donor element used in thermal dye transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanier, Noel Rawle c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/01] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-8000 München 90 / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111914.1 | 30.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | US19880214364 | 01.07.1988 Original published format: US 214364 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348988 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348988 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348988 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
B41M5/443 (EP,US);
B41M2205/30 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/22] |
Former [1990/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Gleitschicht, die ein eine endständige Acyloxygruppe aufweisendes Siloxan enthält, zur Verwendung in einem Farbstoff-Donorelement für die thermische Farbstoffübertragung | [1990/01] | English: | Slipping layer containing acyloxy-terminated siloxane for dye-donor element used in thermal dye transfer | [1990/01] | French: | Couche de glissement contenant un siloxane terminé par des groupes acyloxy- pour un élément donneur de colorant utilisé pour le transfert de colorant par la chaleur | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62003986 ; | [X]EP0163145 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP0138483 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0267469 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4738950 (VANIER NOEL R [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 172 (M-595)(2619) 03 June 1987; & JP-A-62 003 986 (NITTO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL COMPANY LIMITED) 09 January 1987,, & JP62003986 A 19870109 |