EP0349923 - A control means for a universal electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIE ZANUSSI S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo 3 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nodassi, Francesco via Cavour 8 I-33080 Porcia (Pordenone) / IT | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, et al Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89111970.3 | 30.06.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | IT19880045742U | 07.07.1988 Original published format: IT 4574288 U | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349923 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349923 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349923 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/418 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
H02P29/02 (EP);
H02H7/0844 (EP);
H02P25/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Regelvorrichtung für einen Universalmotor | [1990/02] | English: | A control means for a universal electric motor | [1990/02] | French: | Appareil de régulation pour un moteur universel électrique | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3119794 ; | [Y]DE2950092 | [Y] - ELEKTRONIK. vol. 35, no. 14, July 1986, MUNCHEN DE pages 73 - 78; H. SAX ET AL: "MIKROCOMPUTER MIT SENSOR- UND AKTUATOR-INTERFACE" |