EP0349949 - Benzodiazepine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yoshinari 1-9, Higashihagoromo 7-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka 592 / JP | 02 /
Matuo, Teruaki 24-43, Higashiawaji 4-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533 / JP | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112084.2 | 01.07.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | GB19880016207 | 07.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8816207 | GB19880020560 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: GB 8820560 | GB19880023660 | 07.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8823660 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349949 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349949 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349949 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K38/05 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
C07K5/0821 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/35] | C07K5/06, A61K37/02, A61K37/43 | ||
Former IPC [1990/02] | C07K5/06, C07K1/00, A61K37/02, A61K37/43 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Benzodiazepin-Derivate | [1990/02] | English: | Benzodiazepine derivatives | [1990/02] | French: | Derivés de benzodiazépine | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0167919 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) | [A] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 83, July 1986, pages 4923-4926; R.S.L. CHANG et al.: "Biochemical and pharmacological characterization of an extremely potent and selective nonpeptide cholecystokinin antagonist" |