EP0350755 - Method for the dissociation of an oil-in-water emulsion by use of organic dissociation products and use of the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spei, Brigitte Harffstrasse 129 a D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
Wehle, Volker, Dr. Alsenstrasse 7 D-5657 Haan / DE | [1990/03] | Application number, filing date | 89112117.0 | 03.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | DE19883823455 | 11.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823455 | [1990/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0350755 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/04, C10G33/04 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C10G33/04 (EP,US);
B01D17/04 (KR);
B01D17/042 (EP,US);
B01D17/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Spaltung von Oel-Wasseremulsionen unter Verwendung organischer Spaltprodukte und die Verwendung dieses Verfahrens | [1990/03] | English: | Method for the dissociation of an oil-in-water emulsion by use of organic dissociation products and use of the method | [1990/03] | French: | Procédé de dissociation d'émulsions huile-eau en utilisant des produits de dissociation organiques et l'emploi de ce procédé | [1990/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 21.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD125040 ; | [A]DE2507271 ; | [A]DE2927275 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]EP0038986 (BAYER AG [DE]) |