EP0355341 - A disobstructor dilator device for urinary pathology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bozzo, Luigi, Dr. Via Trieste 7/9 B I-16145 Genova / IT | [1990/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Dino, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Porsia, Dino, Dr., et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 I-16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 89112174.1 | 04.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | IT19880012527 | 22.07.1988 Original published format: IT 1252788 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355341 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355341 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61F2/94 (EP,US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61F2002/821 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Eine Räumungsdilatator-Vorrichtung für Harnpathologie | [1990/09] | English: | A disobstructor dilator device for urinary pathology | [1990/09] | French: | Dispositif désobstructif dilatateur pour pathologie urinaire | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.1992 | BE | 07.10.1992 | CH | 07.10.1992 | GR | 07.10.1992 | LI | 07.10.1992 | NL | 07.10.1992 | SE | 07.10.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/18] | AT | 07.10.1992 | |
BE | 07.10.1992 | ||
CH | 07.10.1992 | ||
LI | 07.10.1992 | ||
NL | 07.10.1992 | ||
SE | 07.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 07.10.1992 | |
CH | 07.10.1992 | ||
LI | 07.10.1992 | ||
NL | 07.10.1992 | ||
SE | 07.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | CH | 07.10.1992 | |
LI | 07.10.1992 | ||
SE | 07.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 07.10.1992 | |
LI | 07.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0183372 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0274846 (ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION [US]) |