EP0349984 - Washing device for parts of human body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu City, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states TOTO LTD. No. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsui, Osamu c/o TOTO Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 8-1, Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Haraga, Hisato c/o TOTO Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 8-1, Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Fujino, Kiyoshi c/o TOTO Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 8-1, Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Uchimura, Yoshinobu c/o TOTO Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 8-1, Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Kawamura, Yoshiki c/o TOTO Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 8-1, Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112209.5 | 04.07.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | JP19880168447 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16844788 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349984 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349984 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/08, F24D17/00 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
E03D9/08 (EP,KR,US);
F24D19/1051 (EP,KR,US);
G05D23/1393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Waschvorrichtung für menschliche Körperteile | [1990/02] | English: | Washing device for parts of human body | [1990/02] | French: | Dispositif de lavage pour parties du corps humain | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2647692 (KELLER DAN W, et al); | [Y]US3154793 (CONGDON MILTON H); | [Y]US3814376 (REINICKE R); | [A]US4554688 (PUCCERELLA THOMAS J [US]); | [A]EP0257135 (TOTO LTD [JP]) |