EP0355342 - Substrate having a light-transmissive phase change ink printed thereon and method for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/09] | Substrates having a light-transmissive phase change ink printed thereon and methods for producing same | ||
[1998/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Corporate Headquarters, 26600 S.W. Parkway Wilsonville Oregon 97070-1000 / US | For all designated states SPECTRA, INC. Etna Road Hanover, New Hampshire 03755 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Corporate Headquarters, 26600 S.W. Parkway Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | ||
For all designated states SPECTRA, INC. Etna Road Hanover, New Hampshire 03755 / US | |||
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Corporate Headquarters, 26600 S.W. Parkway Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | ||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Titterington, Donald R. 10185 S. W. Siletz Drive Tualatin Oregon 97062 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Jeffrey J. 16509 S. E. 34th Way Camas Washington 98607 / US | 03 /
Rise, James D. 7900 S. W. Brentwood, No.3 Portland Oregon 97225 / US | 04 /
Jaeger, Charles Wayne 16151 S. W. DeLine Court Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112211.1 | 04.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880236490 | 25.08.1988 Original published format: US 236490 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355342 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355342 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355342 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
B41M7/0081 (EP,US);
C09D11/34 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | B41M7/00, C09D11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/09] | Title | German: | Mit einer lichtdurchlässigen Phasenaustausch-Tinte bedrucktes Substrat und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/16] | English: | Substrate having a light-transmissive phase change ink printed thereon and method for producing same | [1998/16] | French: | Substrat imprimé avec une encre translucide à changement de phase et son procédé de fabrication | [1998/16] |
Former [1990/09] | Mit einer lichtdurchlässigen Phasenaustausch-Tinte bedruckte Substrate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1990/09] | Substrates having a light-transmissive phase change ink printed thereon and methods for producing same | ||
Former [1990/09] | Substrats imprimés avec une encre translucide à changement de phase et leurs procédés de fabrication | Examination procedure | 27.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59196285 ; | [A]JP60042091 ; | [X]GB1545466 (WIGGINS TEAPE LTD); | [X]GB2142579 (CANON KK); | [X]GB544884 (CHAMPLAIN CORP); | [X]US3170393 (REINKE GEORGE W); | [E]EP0353979 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) | [X] - Database WPIL @ Derwent Publications London UK AN 84-314794 (51) & JP-A-59196285 (Mitshubishi Paper Mills) (07.11.1984), & JP59196285 A 00000000 | [A] - Database WPIL @ Derwent Publications London UK AN 85-095240 (16) & JP-A-60042091 (Canon KK)(06.03.1095), & JP60042091 A 00000000 | Examination | US4745420 |