EP0362486 - Moulding materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RÜTGERSWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mainzer Landstrasse 217 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states RÜTGERSWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mainzer Landstrasse 217 D-60326 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gardziella, Arno, Dr. Rüdinghauser Berg 4 D-5810 Witten-Rüdinghausen / DE | 02 /
Kwasniok, Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Vor dem Hopey 8 D-5860 Iserlohn / DE | 03 /
Adolphs, Peter, Dr. Tellenkamp 2 D-5750 Menden-Halingen / DE | 04 /
Wetzig, Ralf Sonderhorstweg 11 D-5860 Iserlohn 7 / DE | [1990/15] | Application number, filing date | 89112235.0 | 05.07.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | DE19883833855 | 05.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3833855 | [1990/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0362486 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0362486 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362486 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/00, C08G18/54, C08G18/18 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
B22C1/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Formstoffe | [1990/15] | English: | Moulding materials | [1990/15] | French: | Matériaux de moulage | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 12.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3590902 (WALKER JAMES, et al); | [A]US3726867 (ROBINS J); | [X]GB2050400 (ASHLAND OIL INC); | [A]US4436881 (LAITAR ROBERT A [US]) |