EP0350014 - Volume phase type hologram and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshinaga, Yoko 21-19, Haramachida 4-chome Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kushibiki, Nobuo 2-2-201, Fukuda 5-chome Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kuwayama, Tetsuro 1-21, Utsukushigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Taniguchi, Naosato Canon Daiichi Honatsugiryo, 6-29 Mizuhiki 2-chome Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/02] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112291.3 | 05.07.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | JP19880166885 | 06.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16688588 | JP19880173894 | 14.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17389488 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350014 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350014 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350014 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/02, G03F7/00 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
G03H1/18 (EP,US);
G03F7/001 (EP,US);
G03H1/02 (EP,US);
G03H1/0248 (EP,US);
G03H1/182 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0264 (EP,US);
G03H2260/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/02] | Title | German: | Volumenhologramm und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [1990/02] | English: | Volume phase type hologram and method of manufacture thereof | [1990/02] | French: | Hologramme de phase en volume et procédé de fabrication | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 28.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61070573 ; | [X]US4069049 (REICH SHYMON, et al); | [X]US4173474 (NISHIDE KATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [X]US4201441 (KISHI HIROYOSHI [JP], et al); | [E]EP0349982 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]US3560210 (GROBIN ALLEN W JR); | [Y]US4722037 (DAVIS CHARLES S [US]); | [AD]DE2733703 (CANON KK) | [X] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 15, no. 2, February 1976, pages 534-541; W.J. TOMLINSON et al.: "Multicomponent photopolymer systems for volume phase holograms and grating devices". | [X] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 10, no. 7, July 1971, pages 1636-1641; W.S. COLBURN et al.: "Volume hologram formation in photopolymer materials". | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 241 (P-488)[2297], 20th August 1986; & JP-A-61 070 573 (FUJITSU) 11-04-1986., & JP61070573 A 00000000 | Examination | - SOLIMAN, COOK "Volume Holography and Volume Gratings" (1981), pp. 254, 255, 292-298; | - Y. YAMAGISHI et al., SPIE Vol. 600 Progress in Holographic Applications (1985), pp. 14-19 | - Y. KUWAE et al., Makromol. Chem. Macromol. Symp. 37, 1990, pp. 229-238 |