EP0354351 - Rolling stand for flat products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kircher, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Peter-Kraft-Strasse 68 D-4030 Ratingen / DE | [1990/07] | Application number, filing date | 89112430.7 | 07.07.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | DE19883826822 | 06.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3826822 | [1990/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354351 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354351 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/20 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
B21B13/20 (EP);
B21B31/08 (EP);
B21B31/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/07] | Title | German: | Walzgerüst für Flachprodukte | [1990/07] | English: | Rolling stand for flat products | [1990/07] | French: | Cage de laminoir pour produits laminés plats | [1990/07] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/43] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB655190 ; | [AD]DE956393 ; | [A]FR1215979 | [A] - JAPANESE PATENT GAZETTE, Woche 7630, Sektion General/Mechanical, Accession Nr. 76-56692X (30), Derwent Publications Ltd, LondonGB; & JP-A³51 066 263 (HITACHI K.K.) 08-06-1976 |