Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] |
05.02.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] |
28.03.1990 | Change - applicant | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] |
28.03.1990 | Change - representative | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] |
23.12.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |