EP0350825 - Electrical switch gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Runtsch, Erhard Karlsbader Strasse 17 D-6944 Hemsbach / DE | 02 /
Greefe, Klaus Hausser Strasse 55 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Dymke, Dietmar Maria-Probst-Strasse 15 D-6903 Neckargemünd / DE | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1990/03] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112549.4 | 10.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | DE19883824027 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3824027 | [1990/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350825 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350825 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350825 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/18, H01H9/42, H01H9/46 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
H01H9/465 (EP);
H01H9/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/03] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Schaltgerät | [1990/03] | English: | Electrical switch gear | [1990/03] | French: | Appareil de commutation électrique | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2584529 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [A]EP0205369 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [A]DE2944619 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]); | [A]FR2409593 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]); | [A]EP0111662 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) |