EP0355374 - Ferroelectric chiral smectic liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal device using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Masataka 1-20-24-102 Nakahara Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Togano, Takeshi 1-28-12 Gontazaka Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Terada, Masahiro 381-1-9-1 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Akio 9-27 Asahigaoka Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Kimura, Yoshiko 432-B203 Toyodabyodohji Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Shinjo, Kenji Canon-ryo 2-10-1 Asahicho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Kitayama, Hiroyuki 1-8-19-201 Kamitsuruma Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Nakamura, Shinichi Canon-ryo 2-10-1 Asahicho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/09] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112756.5 | 12.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | JP19880175787 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17578788 | JP19880202445 | 13.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20244588 | JP19890025047 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2504789 | JP19890147996 | 09.06.1989 Original published format: JP 14799689 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355374 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355374 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355374 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/42, C09K19/02, G02F1/13 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C09K19/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | C09K19/00, G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Ferroelektrische, chirale, smektische Flüssigkristall-Zusammensetzung und Vorrichtung zu deren Anwendung | [1990/09] | English: | Ferroelectric chiral smectic liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal device using same | [1990/09] | French: | Composition de cristal liquide smectique chirale ferro-électrique et dispositif l'utilisant | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3706766 ; | [A]EP0260077 |