EP0353507 - Weather strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1990/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Shigeru No. 471-2 Odawara City / JP | 02 /
Sugawara, Hiroshi No. 2-14-14, Sasage Konan-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89112771.4 | 12.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | JP19880173272 | 12.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17327288 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353507 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353507 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/06, C08L9/02, C08K5/10, // (C08L9/02, 27:06) | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C08K5/11 (EP,US);
B60J10/15 (EP,US);
B60J10/70 (EP,US);
B60J10/74 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08L9/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/11, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L27/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L27/06, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L9/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/06] | Title | German: | Dichtungsprofil | [1990/06] | English: | Weather strip | [1990/06] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61238507 ; | [A]RO87829 | [AD] - DATABASE WPIL, abstract no. 86-322186 (49), Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-61 238 507 (TOYODA GOSEI K.K.) 23-10-1986, & JP61238507 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, 1986, page 57, abstract no. 154325h, Columbus, Ohio, US; P. FILIP et al.: "Unsupported pressure-sensitive adhesive strip", & RO-A-87 829 (INTREPRINDEREA DE PRELUCRARE MASE PLASTICE) 09-01-1986, & RO87829 A 00000000 | [A] - J.V. DEL GATTO, "Materials and compounding ingredients for rubber", Rubber Automative Publications, 1970, New York, US, pages 161,167 |