EP0352552 - Process for illuminating an object in a transmission electron microscope and electron microscope suitable for that process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/05] | Process for illuminating an object in a transmission electron microscope | ||
[1994/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Zeiss D-73446 Oberkochen / DE | [1991/11] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states Firma Carl Zeiss D-7920 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benner, Gerd Dr. Hermelinstrasse 53 D-7080 Aalen / DE | [1990/05] | Application number, filing date | 89112801.9 | 13.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | DE19883825103 | 23.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3825103 | [1990/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352552 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352552 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352552 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/26 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
H01J37/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1990/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beleuchten eines Objektes in einem Transmissions-Elektronenmikroskop und dazu geeignetes Elektronenmikroskop | [1994/02] | English: | Process for illuminating an object in a transmission electron microscope and electron microscope suitable for that process | [1994/02] | French: | Procédé d'éclairement d'un objet dans un microscope électronique à transmission et microscope électronique apte à la mise en ouvre du procédé | [1994/02] |
Former [1990/05] | Verfahren zum Beleuchten eines Objektes in einem Transmissions-Elektronenmikroskop | ||
Former [1990/05] | Process for illuminating an object in a transmission electron microscope | ||
Former [1990/05] | Procédé d'éclairement d'un objet dans un microscope électronique à transmission | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3560781 (RIECKE WOLFGANG DIETER); | [A]FR2153346 (JEOL LTD) | [A] - OPTIK. vol. 48, no. 1, 1977, STUTTGART DE Seiten 95 - 118; J R A Cleaver: "An illumination system for a 600kV high resolution electron microscope with a condenser-objective lens" |