Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0350966
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
17.08.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] |
06.10.2000 |
Change - priority |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
01.09.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] |
21.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.04.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.10.1999 |
Change - appeal |
|
22.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.07.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
09.04.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
17.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.10.1997 |
Change - appeal number |
|
19.09.1997 |
Change - appeal |
|
25.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.07.1997 |
Change - appeal |
|
10.05.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
10.05.1997 |
Application refused |
|
28.11.1996 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
16.11.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.07.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] |
15.06.1994 |
First examination report |
|
27.06.1991 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] |
02.12.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] |
02.12.1989 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] |