EP0350966 - Barrel shifter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokumaru, Takeji 1615-12, Nakata-cho Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113058.5 | 17.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | JP19880175222 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17522288 | [2000/47] |
Former [1990/03] | JP19880017522 | 15.07.1988 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350966 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350966 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350966 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F5/01 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
G06F5/015 (EP,US);
H03K17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/03] | Title | German: | Multipositionsverschieber | [1990/03] | English: | Barrel shifter | [1990/03] | French: | Décaleur multiple | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.05.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.07.1997 | Appeal received No. T1031/97 | 16.09.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 01.07.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0228948 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE: ICCC 19080 October 1980, PORT CHESTER, NY, USA pages 1184 - 1187; BLOCK ET AL: 'Architecture for VLSI-circuits in digital signal processing ' | Examination | GB2090447 | EP0130413 |