EP0354996 - Fibre-optical device to measure absolute positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORNIER GMBH Postfach 1420 88004 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | For all designated states DORNIER GMBH Postfach 1420 D-88004 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sontag, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Rebhalde 6 D-7990 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
Elias, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Unterer Schützenrain 16 D-7758 Meersburg / DE | 03 /
Ludwig, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Seeblickstrasse 8 CH-8274 Trägerwilen / CH | 04 /
Fritsch, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. J.P.-Hebelstrasse 11 D-7778 Markdorf / DE | 05 /
Eschner, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Baitenhauser Strasse 5 D-7758 Daisendorf / DE | 06 /
Hundhausen, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Normannenweg 46 D-7997 Immenstaad / DE | 07 /
Kratz, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. Untere Holunderstaffel 15 D-7992 Tettnang / DE | [1990/08] | Representative(s) | Landsmann, Ralf Dornier GmbH LHG 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | Landsmann, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113064.3 | 17.07.1989 | [1990/08] | Priority number, date | DE19883826067 | 30.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3826067 | [1990/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354996 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354996 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354996 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G01D5/26 | [1990/08] | CPC: |
G01D5/268 (EP,US);
G01B11/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur faseroptischen Messung von Absolutpositionen | [1990/08] | English: | Fibre-optical device to measure absolute positions | [1990/08] | French: | Dispositif à fibres optiques pour mesurer des positions absolues | [1990/08] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 04.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58070346 ; | [X]FR2194949 (SELCOM AB [SE]); | [X]DE3511330 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]DE3643842 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 164 (P-211)[1309], 19. Juli 1983; & JP-A-58 070 346 (ASAHI DOW K.K.) 26-04-1983, & JP58070346 A 00000000 |