EP0352596 - Suction electrodes for electro-medical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sieber, Gotthold, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hedenusstrasse 27 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1990/05] | Application number, filing date | 89113093.2 | 17.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | DE19880009707U | 29.07.1988 Original published format: DE 8809707 U | [1990/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0352596 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352596 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
A61B5/252 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/05] | Title | German: | Saugelektrodenvorrichtung für elektromedizinische Geräte | [1990/05] | English: | Suction electrodes for electro-medical apparatus | [1990/05] | French: | Jeu d'électrodes en forme de ventouse relié à un appareil électro-médical | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 18.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.12.1993 | GB | 08.12.1993 | IT | 08.12.1993 | NL | 08.12.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 08.12.1993 | |
IT | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
FR | 29.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 08.12.1993 | |
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
FR | 29.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | GB | 08.12.1993 | |
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 08.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2513445 ; | [AD]DE1939523 (NIESS INGEBORG ELEKTROMEDIZIN); | [Y]DE1952893 (KRAMPE & CO); | [A]DE2742058 (RAU GUENTER PROF DIPL ING DR R); | [Y]DE3502913 (RAU GUENTER); | [AD]EP0199694 (ASTRA TECH AB [SE]) |