EP0357916 - Conveying device for multi-layer webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pawlowski, Adam, Dr. Pariser Strasse 5 D-1000 Berlin 15 / DE | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/08] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/05] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/11] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113167.4 | 18.07.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | DE19880011453U | 09.09.1988 Original published format: DE 8811453 U | [1990/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0357916 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0357916 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0357916 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H20/02, B65H27/00 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
B41J15/18 (EP,US);
B65H20/02 (EP,US);
B65H27/00 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1116 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1341 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1344 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/17] |
Former [1990/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung für mehrlagige Materialbahnen | [1990/11] | English: | Conveying device for multi-layer webs | [1990/11] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour bandes multicouches | [1990/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, GR, LU | 21.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.10.1989 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.10.1993 | [1994/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0233456 (CERUTTI SPA OFF MEC [IT]); | [A]FR2000686 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG); | [A]US3411686 (BENDER HAROLD W) |