EP0351792 - Table lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTEMIDE SIDECAR S.R.L. Via Montenapoleone, 18 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1990/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giorgi, Giorgio Rua Alagoas, 162/32 Sao Paulo / BR | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1990/04] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 89113173.2 | 18.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | BR19888803984 | 19.07.1988 Original published format: BR 8803984 | [1990/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351792 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351792 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/32 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
F21S6/006 (EP,US);
F21V21/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/04] | Title | German: | Tischleuchte | [1990/04] | English: | Table lamp | [1990/04] | French: | Lampe de table | [1990/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/51] | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2286851 (DAVID HESS); | [X]GB2113818 (GRICE ANTHONY ROLAND); | [A]US4630185 (COPELAND ANTHONY S [CA]) |