EP0408785 - Door or window fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBRÜDER GOLDSCHMIDT BAUBESCHLÄGE GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Grubenstrasse 6 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1999/40] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER GOLDSCHMIDT BAUBESCHLÄGE GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Grubenstrasse 6 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldschmidt, Hans-Gerd In der Rose 24 D-5628 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Masch, Karl Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Masch, Karl Gerhard, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113203.7 | 19.07.1989 | [1991/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408785 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408785 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0408785 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/06 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
E05B3/06 (EP);
E05B15/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/04] | Title | German: | Fenster- oder Türbeschlag | [1991/04] | English: | Door or window fittings | [1991/04] | French: | Ensemble de béquille pour portes ou fenêtres | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.1994
16.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Eisenhüttenstr. 22 D-57074 Siegen / DE | [1994/29] | 05.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.11.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.03.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.05.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.06.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.09.1993 | FR | 01.09.1993 | GB | 01.09.1993 | IT | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | AT | 19.07.1994 | CH | 31.07.1994 | LI | 31.07.1994 | LU | 31.07.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/06] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
GB | 01.09.1993 | ||
IT | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
FR | 21.01.1994 | ||
AT | 19.07.1994 | ||
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
LU | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
GB | 01.09.1993 | ||
IT | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
FR | 21.01.1994 | ||
AT | 19.07.1994 | ||
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1996/02] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
GB | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
FR | 21.01.1994 | ||
AT | 19.07.1994 | ||
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
GB | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
FR | 21.01.1994 | ||
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
GB | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
FR | 21.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/41] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
GB | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB320093 (LUCAS LTD JOSEPH, et al); | [A]FR2104064 (VER BAUBESCHLAG GRETSCH CO); | [A]FR2317451 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) |