EP0351819 - Standard cells with flip-flops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP | |||
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-COMPUTER ENGINEERING CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Tohru 1-20, Sinmei-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tokumaru, Takeji 1615-12, Nakata-cho Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kudo, Tsuneaki 1-21-3, Hama-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113243.3 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | JP19880178214 | 19.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17821488 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351819 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351819 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351819 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/06, G11C11/41, G11C19/28 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
G11C5/063 (EP,US);
H03K19/177 (KR);
G11C11/41 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/04] | G11C5/06, G11C19/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/04] | Title | German: | Standard-Zellen mit Flip-Flops | [1990/04] | English: | Standard cells with flip-flops | [1990/04] | French: | Cellules standard avec des flip-flops | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.10.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55115352 ; | [A]EP0006958 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2229123 (IBM) | [A] - I.E.E.E. JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-22, no. 2, April 1987, pages 190-197, IEEE, New York, NY, US; A.M. MARTINEZ et al.: "Compilation of standard-cell libraries" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 165 (E-34)[647], 15th November 1980; & JP-A-55 115 352 (FUJITSU K.K.) 05-09-1980, & JP55115352 A 00000000 |