EP0361000 - Optical line sensor with a plurality of sensitive elements, made of a photoelectric material with a polycrystalline or amorphous structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mader, Gerhard, Dr. Haupstrasse 47 D-8025 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
Kleinschmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Klagenfurter Strasse 12 D-8000 München 80 / DE | [1990/14] | Application number, filing date | 89113256.5 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19883833159 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3833159 | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361000 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361000 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H04N25/573 (EP);
H04N25/00 (US);
H04N25/701 (EP);
H04N3/1506 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/14] | Title | German: | Optische Sensorzeile aus amorphen oder polykristallinem photo-elektrischem Material mit einer Vielzahl von Sensorelementen | [1990/14] | English: | Optical line sensor with a plurality of sensitive elements, made of a photoelectric material with a polycrystalline or amorphous structure | [1990/14] | French: | Capteur de ligne optique muni d'une pluralité d'éléments capteurs réalisés dans un matériau photo-électrique de structure amorphe ou polycristalline | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/28] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59133439 ; | [A]DE3408284 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH); | [A]DE3427055 (LEITZ ERNST GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE8524244U ; | [A]DE3706252 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]DE3633182 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |