EP0352620 - Process and apparatus for regulating the firing power of combustion plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARTIN GmbH für Umwelt- und Energietechnik Leopoldstrasse 248 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states MARTIN GmbH für Umwelt- und Energietechnik Leopoldstrasse 248 D-80807 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Johannes Josef Edmund Leopoldstrasse 248 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Zmyj, Erwin Reismühlenstrasse 41 81477 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | Zmyj, Erwin, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Rosenheimer Strasse 52/II D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113259.9 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | DE19883825931 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3825931 | [1990/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352620 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352620 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352620 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/02, F23N5/08, F23G5/50 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
F23N5/102 (EP,US);
F23N1/022 (EP,US);
F23N5/082 (EP,US);
F23N2229/20 (EP,US);
F23N2233/06 (EP,US);
F23N2235/06 (EP,US);
F23N2237/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/05] | F23N1/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Feuerungsleistung von Verbrennungsanlagen | [1990/05] | English: | Process and apparatus for regulating the firing power of combustion plants | [1990/05] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de régulation de la puissance de combustion d'installations de combustion | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 03.06.1994 | Appeal received No. T0782/94 | 24.08.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.02.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 07.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.1997
18.08.1997
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Babcock Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Str. 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE Opponent's representative Radünz, Ingo Patentanwalt Schumannstrasse 100 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.1997
18.08.1997
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Babcock Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Str. 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE Opponent's representative Radünz, Ingo Patentanwalt Schumannstrasse 100 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.1997
18.08.1997
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Babcock Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Str. 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | 09.09.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.10.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.08.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/45] | Appeal following opposition | 10.11.1998 | Appeal received No. T1136/98 | 03.04.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.08.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6136611 ; | [A]JP6136612 ; | [XP]EP0317731 ; | [A]US4737844 (KOHOLA PEKKA [FI], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 191 (M-495)(2247) 04 Juli 1986, & JP-A-61 36611 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND) 21 Juni 1986,, & JP6136611 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 191 (M-495)(2247) 04 Juni 1986, & JP-A-61 36612 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND) 21 Februar 1986,, & JP6136612 A 00000000 |