EP0355411 - Intramedullary rod for femur stabilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ace Medical Company 2260 East El Segundo Blvd. El Segundo CA 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Ace Medical Company 2260 East El Segundo Blvd. El Segundo CA 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zindrick, Michael R. 151 Juliet Ct. Clarendon Hills Illinois 60514 / US | 02 /
Sohngen, Gary W. 2101 Paseo Del Mar San Pedro California 90732 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Lehmann, Klaus, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Lehmann, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schroeter, Fleuchaus, Lehmann, Wehser, Holzer & Gallo, Patentanwälte, Postfach 71 03 50 D-81453 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113359.7 | 20.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880230563 | 10.08.1988 Original published format: US 230563 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355411 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/7233 (EP);
A61B17/72 (EP);
A61B17/744 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1990/09] | Title | German: | Intramedullärer Stift zur Oberschenkelknochenfestigung | [1990/09] | English: | Intramedullary rod for femur stabilization | [1990/09] | French: | Broche intramédullaire pour stabiliser le fémur | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 23.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/15] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4475545 ; | [Y]DE3324103 ; | [Y]US4622959 ; | [AP]GB2209947 ; | [A]EP0273872 ; | [A]DE3537318 |