EP0352726 - Liquid-jet recording head and recording apparatus employing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Tsuguhiro 1016-6-212, Ichigao Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakagomi, Hiroshi 1-1, Tsukimino 6-chome Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Karita, Seiichirou 4-20, Shinishikawa Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/05] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113681.4 | 25.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | JP19880184691 | 26.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18469188 | [1990/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352726 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352726 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352726 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/377, B41J2/14 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
B41J29/377 (EP,US);
B41J2/1408 (EP,US);
B41J2/14145 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14379 (EP,US);
B41J2202/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/05] | B41J29/377 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/05] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und Aufzeichnungsgerät, versehen mit diesem Kopf | [1990/05] | English: | Liquid-jet recording head and recording apparatus employing the same | [1990/05] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement par jet de liquide et appareil l'utilisant | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.04.1994 | IT | 27.04.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4611219 (SUGITANI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4723136 (SUZUMURA MASAMICHI [JP]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 24, no. 12, May 1982, NEW YORK US pages 6323 - 6324; R.V. Firth e.a.: "Cooling a thermal print head." |