EP0361018 - Anchoring part for façade boarding anchors, and façade boarding equipped with same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deha Ankersysteme GmbH & Co. KG Breslauer Strasse 3 64521 Gross-Gerau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states Deha Ankersysteme GmbH & Co. KG Breslauer Strasse 3 D-64521 Gross-Gerau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ernst, Peter, Dr. Ing. Lindenstrasse 7 D-6234 Hattersheim 1 / DE | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89113921.4 | 28.07.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19880011647U | 14.09.1988 Original published format: DE 8811647 U | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361018 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361018 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04B2/94 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
E04F13/0855 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, LU, NL [1990/14] | Title | German: | Verankerungsteil für Fassadenplattenanker und damit ausgestattete Fassadenplatte | [1990/14] | English: | Anchoring part for façade boarding anchors, and façade boarding equipped with same | [1990/14] | French: | Partie d'ancrage pour ancres d'éléments de façade et élément de façade ainsi équipé | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 12.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2095793 (HAEUSSLER ERNST); | [A]DE2301023 (BEINE KARLHEINZ); | [A]DE1683167 ; | [A]DE2836817 (CLAVEY WILLI); | [A]AT370471B (RISS GES M B H [AT]); | [AD]DE3411003 (DEHA BAUBEDARF KG [DE]); | [AD]EP0144784 (RISS HEINZ G); | [Y]DE3503406 (CLAVEY WILLI); | [YD]DE3608953 (DEHA BAUBEDARF KG [DE]) |