EP0373293 - Injection molding rack and pinion valve pin actuating mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gellert, Jobst Ulrich 7A Prince Street Georgetown Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states Gellert, Jobst Ulrich 7A Prince Street Georgetown Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114133.5 | 31.07.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | CA19880586166 | 16.12.1988 Original published format: CA 586166 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373293 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373293 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373293 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/28 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
B29C45/281 (EP);
B29C2045/2834 (EP);
B29C2045/2837 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Zahnstangenbetätigungsmechanismus für Spritzgiessventilnadel | [1990/25] | English: | Injection molding rack and pinion valve pin actuating mechanism | [1990/25] | French: | Mécanisme de commande à crémaillère pour l'aiguille d'obturateur de moulage par injection | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 12.04.1995 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE931677 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]FR2237750 (HEHL KARL [DE]); | [A]GB2085350 (GELLERT JOBST U); | [YD]EP0099088 (GELLERT JOBST U) |