Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] |
24.02.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] |
25.05.1993 | First examination report | |
16.12.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |
24.04.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] |
05.05.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.06.1990 [1990/25] |