EP0411178 - Process to prepare a cooked product based on animal protein for long term preservation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Service des Brevets Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Service des Brevets Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cadet, Michel 131, rue de la Libération F-60 530 Le Mesnil en Thelle / FR | 02 /
Prost, Jean 939 Ch. des Solons F-60 650 Ons En Bray / FR | [1991/06] | Application number, filing date | 89114193.9 | 01.08.1989 | [1991/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0411178 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411178 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/314, A23B4/00, A23L3/22, A23K1/18, A23L1/325 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
A23L3/225 (EP);
A23B4/005 (EP);
A23K50/40 (EP);
A23L13/422 (EP);
A23L17/70 (EP);
A23L17/75 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kochproduktes mit verlängerter Konservierung auf der Basis von Tierproteinen | [1991/06] | English: | Process to prepare a cooked product based on animal protein for long term preservation | [1991/06] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un produit cuit à conservation prolongée à base de protéine animale | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1989 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB681052 (ALGEMENE KUNSTZIJDE UNIE NV); | [A]GB1521003 (APV CO LTD); | [A]US4113890 (LONG MARSHALL); | [A]GB2141917 (TETRA PAK DEV); | [A]EP0290251 (MARS G B LTD [GB]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF FOOF SCIENCE, vol. 48, 1983, pages 1-5; L. WALLINGFORD: "Evaluation of the water binding properties of food hydrocolloids by physical/chemical methods and in a low fat meat emulsion" |