EP0353718 - Road traffic signal giver with a low voltage lamp fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krautwald, Herbert Klobensteinerstrasse 35/0 D-8000 München 90 / DE | 02 /
Jovic, Simé Schaffhauserstrasse 6/V D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1990/06] | Application number, filing date | 89114211.9 | 01.08.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | DE19883826567 | 04.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3826567 | [1990/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353718 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353718 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353718 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/095 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
G08G1/095 (EP);
F21V19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Signalgeber der Strassenverkehrstechnik mit einer Niedervolt-Lampenfassung | [1990/06] | English: | Road traffic signal giver with a low voltage lamp fitting | [1990/06] | French: | Donneur de signal de la technique du trafic routier avec douille pour lampe à basse tension | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE527566 (C & W BOHNERT A G); | [A]DE534927 (WILLI HOLZ); | [A]DE2613405 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4175661 (BARNES JOCELYN T [US]); | [A]US4720774 (ZURCHER FREDRIC [US], et al) |