EP0353745 - Method and device for the control of saw balde excursions during the cutting-off of wafers of non-magnetizable work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemitronic Gesellschaft für Elektronik-Grundstoffe mbH Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemitronic Gesellschaft für Elektronik-Grundstoffe mbH Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junge, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Kehlsteinstrasse 5 D-8269 Burgkirchen / DE | 02 /
Glas, Johann, Ing.-(grad) Vivaldistrasse 12 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Niedermeier, Johann Hochkalterstrasse 4 D-8269 Burgkirchen / DE | 04 /
Brehm, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Forststrasse 27 D-8261 Emmerting / DE | [1990/06] | Application number, filing date | 89114302.6 | 03.08.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | DE19883826698 | 05.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3826698 | [1990/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353745 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353745 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353745 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B28D5/02, B23D59/00, // B23Q15/007 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B23D59/002 (EP,US);
B28D5/028 (EP,US);
Y10T83/141 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/06] | B28D5/02, // B23Q15/007 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1990/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrole des Schnittverlaufes beim Abtrennen von Scheiben von nichtmagnetisierbaren Werkstücken | [1990/06] | English: | Method and device for the control of saw balde excursions during the cutting-off of wafers of non-magnetizable work pieces | [1990/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le contrôle des déviations d'une lame de scie pendant le découpage de tranches de pièces non magnétisables | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 03.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]JP02167703 ; | [A]DE1279328 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]DE2804678 (ZUMBACH ELECTRONIC AG [CH]); | [A]DE3608572 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0269997 (WACKER CHEMITRONIC [DE]) | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 5, Oktober 1982, NEW YORK US Seiten 2283 - 2284; P.R. CARUFE ET AL.: "System for Controlling Saw Blade Excursions During the Slicing of Silicon Crystals" | [AD] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY. Juli 1985, WASHINGTON US Seiten 119 - 123; R.L. LANE: "ID Slicing Technology for Large Diameters" | [T] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 424 (M-1024)(4367) 12 September 1990, & JP-A-02 167703 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP.) 28 Juni 1990,, & JP02167703 A 19900912 |