EP0411189 - X-ray diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horbascheck, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Dreibergstrasse 10a D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1991/06] | Application number, filing date | 89114380.2 | 03.08.1989 | [1991/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0411189 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411189 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05G1/26, G06F15/68 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
H05G1/26 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1991/06] | Title | German: | Röntgendiagnostikeinrichtung | [1991/06] | English: | X-ray diagnostic apparatus | [1991/06] | French: | Installation de radiodiagnostic | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3139331 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3500812 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO8404878 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) |