EP0411200 - Oxazoline compounds and herbicides containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SDS Biotech K.K. 12-7 Higashi Shimbashi, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states SDS BIOTECH K.K. 12-7 Higashi Shimbashi, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yukihiro 555, Kizuki 3-chome Nakahara-ku Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Isono, Takashi 820-45, Kurigasawa Matsudo Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Yuichi 1678-15, Ichigaocho Midori-ku Yokohama Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Smolders, Walter, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Smolders, Walter, et al c/o Sandoz AG Patentabteilung CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 89114464.4 | 04.08.1989 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0411200 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0411200 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/48, A01N43/76 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
C07D263/42 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/06] | Title | German: | Oxazolin-Derivate und Herbizide, die sie enthalten | [1991/06] | English: | Oxazoline compounds and herbicides containing the same | [1991/06] | French: | Oxazolines et herbicides les contenant | [1991/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1989 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.04.1994 | DE | 13.04.1994 | FR | 13.04.1994 | LI | 13.04.1994 | GB | 04.08.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/37] | CH | 13.04.1994 | |
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
GB | 04.08.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | CH | 13.04.1994 | |
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
FR | 09.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | CH | 13.04.1994 | |
DE | 13.04.1994 | ||
LI | 13.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 13.04.1994 | |
LI | 13.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1208301 (RICHARD NEIDLEIN DR) |