EP0359966 - Device for reactive ion etching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hübner, Holger, Dr. Hamsterweg 10 D-8011 Baldham / DE | [1990/13] | Application number, filing date | 89114583.1 | 07.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | DE19883832447 | 23.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3832447 | [1990/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0359966 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0359966 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H05H1/46 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
H01J37/32146 (EP,US);
H01J37/32082 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0044 (EP,US);
H01J2237/3341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum reaktiven Ionenätzen | [1990/13] | English: | Device for reactive ion etching | [1990/13] | French: | Dispositif pour la gravure ionique réactive | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 16.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/03] | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6139521 ; | [A]EP0145015 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4585516 (CORN GLENN R [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 192 (E-417)(2248) 05 Juli 1986, & JP-A-61 39521 (ANELVA CORPORATION) 25 Februar 1986,, & JP6139521 A 00000000 |