EP0354523 - Remote control for an electronic apparatus with switching power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohrbacher, Josef c/o Grundig E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ, Stiftung & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Rosenberger, Winfried c/o Grundig E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ, Stiftung & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth / DE | [1990/07] | Application number, filing date | 89114605.2 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | DE19883827210 | 11.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3827210 | [1990/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354523 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354523 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354523 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03J9/06, H04N5/63, G08C23/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
H03J1/0008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/07] | G08C23/00, H04N5/63 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/07] | Title | German: | Fernbedienung für ein mit Schaltnetzteil ausgerüstetes elektronisches Gerät | [1990/07] | English: | Remote control for an electronic apparatus with switching power supply | [1990/07] | French: | Commande à distance pour un appareil électronique à alimentation de puissance à découpage | [1990/07] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2162978 (THORN EMI FERGUSON); | [A]GB2164814 (SHARP KK); | [A]EP0211554 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [AD]DE3601738 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) |