EP0361038 - Method of straightening an elongate metal object, in particular the connecting rod of a reciprocating-piston engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelmohr, Franz Anzengruberstrasse 10a D-8037 Olching / DE | [1990/14] | Application number, filing date | 89114612.8 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19883830028 | 03.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3830028 | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361038 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361038 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361038 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D3/12 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
B21D3/12 (EP);
B21D3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Richten eines länglichen Metallteiles, insbesondere eines Pleuels für Hubkolbenmaschinen | [1990/14] | English: | Method of straightening an elongate metal object, in particular the connecting rod of a reciprocating-piston engine | [1990/14] | French: | Procédé de dressage de produits allongés en métal, en particulier une bielle d'une machine à pistons alternatifs | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.07.1993 | [1994/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1320748 (AVCO CORP); | [Y]FR2578457 (UNIMETALL SA [FR]); | [AD]FR2195486 (GKN GROUP SERVICES LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2068277 (TRANSEQUIP LTD) |