EP0364683 - Lateral-view window for the handicapped [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rieck, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Fasanenstrasse 30 D-8000 München 60 / DE | 02 /
Jarausch, Franz Bergstrasse 9 D-8061 Röhrmoos / DE | [1990/17] | Application number, filing date | 89114644.1 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | DE19883835685 | 20.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3835685 | [1990/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364683 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364683 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62D47/02, B60J1/08 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
B62D47/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/17] | B62D47/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1990/17] | Title | German: | Seitenwandsichtfenster für Behinderte | [1990/17] | English: | Lateral-view window for the handicapped | [1990/17] | French: | Fenêtre de vision latérale pour handicapés | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/44] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB534253 | [X] - ENGINEERING, Band 224, Nr. 6, Juni 1984, Seiten 478-479, LondonGB; "Ergonomics for the elderly" |