EP0359970 - Locking hinge for a multipurpose ladder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hailo-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse D-35708 Haiger / DE | [1990/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeifer, Rudolf Sängerstrasse 55 D-5245 Mudersbach / DE | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114647.4 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | DE19883830251 | 06.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3830251 | [1990/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359970 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359970 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06C1/32 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
E06C1/32 (EP);
E05D11/1007 (EP);
F16C11/10 (EP);
E05Y2999/00 (EP);
F16C2350/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/13] | Title | German: | Rastgelenk für eine Mehrzweckleiter | [1990/13] | English: | Locking hinge for a multipurpose ladder | [1990/13] | French: | Articulation à verrouillage pour échelle à usages multiples | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.03.1992 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2082571 (FRASSETTO EMILE); | [A]FR2244097 (CHEVANT CLAUDE [FR]); | [A]DE2634752 (LOH KG HAILO WERK); | [A]FR2392268 (MULLCA [FR]) |