EP0358945 - Method of assembling wound rotor of vertical type adjustable speed hydroelectric rotating machine at its installation site [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakuta, Shinsaku 2-14, Higashi-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | 02 /
Yasaka, Yasuhiro 4-5, Takasuzu-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | 03 /
Nagura, Osamu 2-12-4, Ushirono Katsuta-shi Ibaraki 312 / JP | 04 /
Tsuji, Eiji 1-1, Jyounan-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Makoto 9-9, Kanesawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 06 /
Akagawa, Hirotaka 15-6, Nishi Narusawa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114667.2 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | JP19880228708 | 14.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22870888 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358945 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358945 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358945 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/00, H02K15/06 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
H02K15/063 (EP,US);
H02K15/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zusammenbau eines bewickelten Läufers einer hydroelektrischen Drehmaschine vertikaler Bauart und verstellbarer Geschwindigkeit auf seinem Installationsort | [1990/12] | English: | Method of assembling wound rotor of vertical type adjustable speed hydroelectric rotating machine at its installation site | [1990/12] | French: | Méthode d'assemblage de rotor bobiné de machine rotative hydroélectrique du type vertical à vitesse ajustable sur son site d'installation | [1990/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.08.1994 | [1995/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54162103 ; | [A]JP60210153 ; | [A]US2157046 (WOOD ALEXANDER P) | [A] - HYDROTECHNICAL CONSTRUCTION vol. 16, no. 7, July 1982, U.S. pages 365 - 369; L.M.DANILOVA; YU.M.INYUSHIN: 'TECHNOLOGY OF INSTALLATION AND MAINTENANCE OF HYDROPOWER EQUIPMENT REDUCING THE COST OF THE POWERHOUSE' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 24 (E-173)29 February 1980 & JP-A-54 162 103 ( HITACHI ) 22 December 1979, & JP54162103 A 19791222 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 58 (E-386)(2115) 7 March 1986 & JP-A-60 210 153 ( HITACHI ) 22 October 1985, & JP60210153 A 19851022 | [A] - AEI ENGINEERING vol. 5, no. 4, July 1965, LONDON GB pages 199 - 201; E.ZAAL: 'A NEW MECHANICAL AID FOR WINDING STATORS OF LARGE TURBO-GENERATORS' |