EP0355575 - Method of preventing polymer scale formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Toshihide 3-3 E-702, Tomioka Urayasu-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kaneko, Ichiro Shin-Etsu Kagaku Shataku 1-308 3-9809-7, Doaihon-cho Hazaki-machi Kashima-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Mikio 3-3-24, Shittechuo Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89114679.7 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | JP19880199119 | 10.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19911988 | JP19880199120 | 10.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19912088 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355575 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355575 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355575 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
C08F2/004 (EP,US);
C08F2/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Unterdrückung der Bildung von Polymerkrusten | [1990/09] | English: | Method of preventing polymer scale formation | [1990/09] | French: | Procédé pour empêcher la formation de dépôts de polymère | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2318898 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]FR2320952 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]FR2378045 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [XP]EP0320227 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |