blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0363599

EP0363599 - Device for sorting flat boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.1993
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.1994 [1994/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JONGE POERINK B.V.
Prins Bernhardlaan 51
NL-7620 AA Borne / NL
[1990/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Poerink, Nicolaas Jonge
Prins Bernhardlaan 25
NL-7622 BD Borne / NL
[1990/16]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister
Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/16]Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister
Goldstrasse 36
D-48147 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date89114699.509.08.1989
[1990/16]
Priority number, dateDE1988383543818.10.1988         Original published format: DE 3835438
DE19880012698U10.10.1988         Original published format: DE 8812698 U
DE19880013620U31.10.1988         Original published format: DE 8813620 U
[1990/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0363599
Date:18.04.1990
Language:DE
[1990/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0363599
Date:02.10.1991
Language:DE
[1991/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.1991
ClassificationIPC:B07C5/02, B65G47/256, B65B35/06
[1991/45]
CPC:
B07C5/02 (EP); B65B35/06 (EP); B65G47/256 (EP)
Former IPC [1990/16]B07C5/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1990/16]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Flachdosen[1990/16]
English:Device for sorting flat boxes[1990/16]
French:Dispositif de tri de boîtes plates[1990/16]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure28.03.1992Examination requested  [1992/22]
15.03.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.04.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/01]
12.08.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1994/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2332204  ;
 [A]US3830353  ;
 [A]GB2147867
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.