EP0413045 - Electrical circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Schlegel GmbH & Co. Am Kapellenweg D-88525 Dürmentingen / DE | [1991/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlegel, Eberhard Kapellenweg 8 D-7948 Dürmentingen / DE | 02 /
Jerabek, Karl Marschall-Platz 23/5/16 A-1120 Wien / AT | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/08] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Seestrasse 42 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115145.8 | 17.08.1989 | [1991/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413045 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413045 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/00 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
H05K3/0052 (EP);
H05K1/0293 (EP);
H05K2201/0909 (EP);
H05K2201/09127 (EP);
H05K2201/09972 (EP);
H05K2203/175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1991/08] | Title | German: | Elektrische Leiterplatte | [1991/08] | English: | Electrical circuit board | [1991/08] | French: | Plaque de circuit électrique | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.06.1993 | IT | 23.06.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.06.1993 | |
FR | 12.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3780431 (FEENEY J); | [A]DE2912940 (GORENJE KOERTING); | [A]EP0299380 (ZACHERL MANFRED) |