EP0359997 - Process for the production of sintered dolomite in a rotary kiln [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolomitwerke GmbH Postfach 1380 D-42480 Wülfrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states DOLOMITWERKE GMBH Postfach 1380 D-42480 Wülfrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammer, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. Berliner Allee 44 D-5860 Iserlohn-Letmathe / DE | 02 /
Poggenpohl, Heinzjosef, Berg-Ing.grad Dümpelstrasse 15 D-5800 Hagen-Halden / DE | 03 /
Prange, Rainer, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Chem. In der Asmecke 17 D-5800 Hagen 8 Dahl / DE | 04 /
Richrath, Herbert Eduard-Müller-Strasse 18 D-5800 Hagen / DE | 05 /
Roeder, Alfred, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Phys. Falkstrasse 112 D-4100 Duisburg / DE | [1990/13] | Application number, filing date | 89115149.0 | 17.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | DE19883828997 | 26.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3828997 | [1990/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359997 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359997 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C04B2/10 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
C04B2/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Sinterdolomit in einem Drehrohrofen | [1990/13] | English: | Process for the production of sintered dolomite in a rotary kiln | [1990/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dolomite frittée dans un four rotatif | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1078926 (POLYSIUS GMBH); | [A]DE2203413 (PREROVSKE STROJIRNY NP); | [A]DE2819038 (POLYSIUS AG); | [A]US4626198 (COHEN SIDNEY M [US]) |